MD SB204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing references to "emotional disturbance" to "emotional disability"; providing that specified documents may not be used until the use of specified other documents; providing that nothing in the Act is intended to result in a reduction of federal funds available to the State; etc.
Title
Student Stigma Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (136-3) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |