MD SB2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering from voting to nonvoting the type of membership position the Executive Director of the Maryland Environmental Service holds on the Board of Directors of the Service; removing the Deputy Director of the Service from the Board of Directors; requiring the Director to present certain expense information at each regular meeting of the Board; requiring the Board, by December 31, 2021, and every 5 years thereafter, to obtain a certain assessment of the Board's operations by an independent consultant or accountant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (130-4)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {534264/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-03-22HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations)
2021-03-20HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2021-03-03HouseReferred Appropriations Environment and Transportation
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {959937/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-11SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-26SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB2 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources3101(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3103(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3103.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3106(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3107(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3109(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3126(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3102(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3205(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3208(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3307(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3405(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3501(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3502(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3601(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3603(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0002?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0002f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0002t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0002e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_72_sb0002e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_95993701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_53426401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0002_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0002_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0002_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0296.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1297.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1151.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback