MD SB197 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 1:00 pm Senate Budget and Taxation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, under certain circumstances, a homeowner to retroactively qualify for the Homestead Tax Credit Program for a certain taxable year and the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to calculate a certain assessment as if the credit had been granted for that taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-07SenateHearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2021-10-04SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback