MD SB197 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of a Community Emergency Response Team; providing that an individual may not qualify for the subtraction modification based on membership in a Community Emergency Response Team unless the Community Emergency Response Team maintains specified records and provides specified reports; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2009; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Community Emergency Response Team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0197.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0197f.pdf |