MD SB185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that hearings held by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner be considered open to the public if a member of the public can observe the hearing virtually through an electronic media platform; authorizing the Commissioner to direct that a hearing be held virtually, subject to certain limitations; and requiring the Commissioner to make available a space within the office of the Maryland Insurance Administration with access to the equipment necessary to allow parties to participate in the virtual hearing.
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {533523/1 Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
internet
Open Government
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
internet
Open Government
Telecommunications and Information Technology