MD SB18 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch providing specified benefits, payments, or gifts to an employee of a vehicle dealer; providing that an incentive payment, a reimbursement payment, cash, a gift, or a thing of value to be given by a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to an employee of a dealer may be given directly to the employee or to the dealer to be distributed to the employee in a specified manner; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Benefits to
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] |
Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-01-28 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-26 | Returned Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-01-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-01-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-01-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-08-18 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Gifts
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Salaries
Work, Labor and Employment
Gifts
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Salaries
Work, Labor and Employment