MD SB173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide training to certain Executive Branch agencies on the preparation of certain economic impact analyses; requiring a promulgating unit to establish an electronic registry that allows any small business, nonprofit organization, or other interested party to receive electronic notification when a proposed regulation is posted and to provide an opportunity for comments if the proposed regulation will have a significant small business impact; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {884036/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-23SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback