MD SB17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Applying a certain provision of law related to the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred by certain nonprofit organizations to certain grants and contracts; and providing that a certain provision of law does not require the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred under certain grants and contracts during any fiscal year that began before July 1, 2019.
Title
State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {536280/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {264137/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Contracts
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Time