MD SB168 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a life insurer to refuse an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor only under certain circumstances; requiring an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to include a certain consent and certain signatures; requiring a life insurer to take certain actions as part of certain standards and procedures for policy application and acceptance for policies of life insurance on the life of a minor; applying the Act; etc.
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {237578/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Communications
Disclosure
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Minors
Records
Signatures
Communications
Disclosure
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Minors
Records
Signatures