MD SB164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB324

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the behavioral health services for which the Maryland Department of Health provides service coordination for veterans under certain provisions of law include mental health first aid; requiring that mental health first aid consist of training for veterans and the immediate family members of veterans on how to identify and respond to signs of mental illness and substance use disorders; requiring entities teaching a mental health first aid course to report certain information to the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateReturned Passed
2021-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2021-03-25HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-24HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-08-13SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB324 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB605 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General132702(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General132703(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback