MD HB605 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the behavioral health services for which the Maryland Department of Health provides service coordination for veterans under certain provisions of law include mental health first aid; requiring that mental health first aid consist of training for veterans and the immediate family members of veterans on how to identify and respond to signs of mental illness and substance use disorders; requiring entities teaching a mental health first aid course to report certain information to the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-02-25HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-23HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB164 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Referred Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General132702(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General132703(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback