MD SB163 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Charles County Public Library to partner with an Imagination Library Program to provide free books to children up to 5 years of age; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2026 through 2035 an appropriation of $2.10 for each child registered in the Program for each month that the child is registered in the Program.
Title
Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB108 (Carry Over) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Charles County
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Gifts
Governor
Libraries
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Sunset
Time
Appropriations
Charles County
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Gifts
Governor
Libraries
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0163?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0163f.pdf |