MD SB162 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB799
Note: Carry Over of previous SB231
Note: Carry Over of previous SB231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Behavioral Health Administration within the Maryland Department of Health, the Maryland Center for School Safety, and the Department of Information Technology jointly to develop and publish a cyber safety guide and training course to be implemented in public schools beginning in the 2023-2024 school year; requiring the cyber safety guide and training course to be developed in consultation with professionals who specialize in child development and child psychology; etc.
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB231 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
HB1410 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-17 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
SB231 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
HB1410 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-17 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Certifications
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Harassment
Health
Health, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Psychologists
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Media
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theft
Work, Labor, and Employment
Age
Certifications
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Harassment
Health
Health, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Psychologists
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Media
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theft
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0162?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0162f.pdf |