MD SB16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company to issue policies for employer's liability insurance and insurance under a federal compensation law; providing an exception to a specified prohibition to allow the Company to cancel or refuse to renew or issue a policy for failure to reimburse the Company under a policy with deductibles as required under a specified provision of law; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Issuance, Renewal, and Cancellation of Policies - Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937174/1 Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |