MD SB156 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting an applicant for a handgun qualification license from the requirement to complete a firearms safety training course if the applicant is a certain retired law enforcement officer or a certain active or retired correctional officer, sheriff, or deputy sheriff who has successfully completed an initial correctional officer, sheriff, or deputy sheriff firearms training course approved by the Secretary of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {178475/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-14SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB265 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5117.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback