MD SB156 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a handgun permit to a person who is otherwise qualified, has the consent of a bona fide church or religious organization to carry a handgun on the property of the church or religious organization during services and gatherings, and has the intent to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for purposes related to self-protection or the protection of others while on the property of the church or religious organization; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |