MD SB156 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring owners or managers of apartment buildings or condominiums that contain 10 or more dwelling units to provide for recycling for residents on or before October 1, 2014; requiring that the recycling required under the Act be done in accordance with specified recycling plans; providing for a civil penalty for a violation of the Act; and providing for disbursement of penalties collected under the Act to specified jurisdictions.
Title
Environment - Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0156.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0156f.pdf |