MD SB147 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1457

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions to study existing data on undergraduate and graduate students with chronic health conditions at institutions of higher education in the State; authorizing the Task Force to use State, federal, and academic resources to carry out its functions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on meeting the needs of students with chronic health conditions to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-14SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB59 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1457 (Carry Over) 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback