MD HB59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions to study existing data on undergraduate and graduate students with chronic health conditions at institutions of higher education in the State; authorizing the Task Force to use State, federal, and academic resources to carry out its functions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on meeting the needs of students with chronic health conditions to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2022; etc.
Title
Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-10-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB147 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Students
Sunset
Demographics
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Students
Sunset