MD SB142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurance carriers that offer life insurance, long-term care insurance, and disability insurance policies or contracts from taking certain action regarding coverage based on whether an applicant or a policy or contract holder has requested or undergone genetic testing or the results of the genetic testing.
Title
Genetic Testing - Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long-Term Care Insurance (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB982 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Genetics
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Public Health
Records
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Public Health
Records
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0142?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0142f.pdf |