MD SB135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor without the consent of certain individuals if the minor is at least 16 years of age and consents to the immunization and the health care provider determines the minor is mature and capable of giving informed consent with regard to the immunization; authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor under certain provisions of the Act whether or not a parent is not reasonably available or objects to the provision of the immunization; etc.
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB87 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18-4A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-4A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-4A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-4A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-4A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |