MD HB87 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor without the consent of certain individuals if the minor is at least 16 years of age, consents to the immunization, and the health care provider determines the minor is mature and capable of giving informed consent with regard to the immunization; authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor under certain provisions of the Act whether or not a parent is not reasonably available or objects to the provision of the immunization; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB135 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General18-4A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General18-4A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General18-4A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General18-4A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General18-4A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20107(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20120(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20121(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20122(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20123(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20124(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback