MD SB134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that only a dealer may contract for the sale and delivery of a vehicle by electronic means under certain circumstances; providing that a consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a transaction for the sale or lease of a vehicle with a dealer by electronic means unless the dealer provides the consumer with certain documents and a reasonable opportunity to review the documents before providing an electronic signature; requiring that a vehicle be delivered at a certain location and within a certain time period; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {653891/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-14HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {677577/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-01-13SenateHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-10SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB139 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 71

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law21101(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law21104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback