MD HB139 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that only a dealer may contract for the sale and delivery of a vehicle by electronic means except under certain circumstances; providing that a consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a transaction for the sale or lease of a vehicle with a dealer by electronic means unless the dealer provides the consumer with certain documents and a reasonable opportunity to review the documents before providing an electronic signature; requiring that a vehicle be delivered at a certain location and within a certain time period; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale and Lease of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 71
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (124-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {357673/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-02SenateReferred Finance
2020-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {333191/1 Adopted
2020-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB134 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law21101(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law21104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback