MD SB134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a tax credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide to qualified employees paid earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same rate as the qualified employee normally earns and meets or exceeds certain requirements; making the credit refundable; providing that the total amount of tax credit certificates issued by the Department may not exceed $5,000,000 for any taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {215566/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {879233/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Data
Income Tax
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Data
Income Tax
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Time
Work, Labor and Employment