MD SB130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that an employer send copies of specified reports of an accident or injury to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; repealing a requirement that the Workers' Compensation Commission report to the Commissioner a determination regarding industrial injuries associated with an employer or industry; requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to provide the Commissioner with electronic access to specified employer reports of accidental injury or disability due to occupational disease; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Accidents
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Industry and Technology
Occupational Safety
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Industry and Technology
Occupational Safety
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation