MD SB125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants to qualified incubators to establish diverse and effective business incubators; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 for the Fund in fiscal year 2025; requiring the Corporation to submit an annual report to the General Assembly beginning December 31, 2024, on the number and amount of grants awarded and the names and locations of each grantee; etc.
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {143627/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2022-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 490 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |