MD SB124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste to award grants to county boards of education and public schools to develop and implement programs for reducing food waste and to establish composting of pre- and post-consumer waste; requiring the Maryland Association for Environmental and Outdoor Education to review grant applications and select recipients to be awarded grants by the State Department of Education; etc.
Title
Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-4) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183422/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923128/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB150 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Contracts
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environmental Matters
Food
Grants
Job Training
Minorities
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Students
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Contracts
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environmental Matters
Food
Grants
Job Training
Minorities
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Students
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment