MD HB150 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-17 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 1:00 pm House Ways and Means Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste to award grants to county boards of education and public schools to develop and implement programs for reducing food waste and to establish composting of pre-and post-consumer waste; and requiring the Maryland Association for Environmental and Outdoor Education to review grant applications and select recipients to be awarded grants by the State Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-17HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2021-10-18HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB124 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7129(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback