MD SB1196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the State procurement law the purchase or lease of property for a specified purpose by specified persons if the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland makes a specified determination; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property - Exemption From Procurement Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Real Property
Tri-County Council
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Real Property
Tri-County Council