MD SB1193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law governing the duty of the driver of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way at a highway that intersects with a through highway or at a stop sign or yield sign placed at an intersection.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Yielding the Right-of-Way - Through Highways, Stop Signs, and Yield Signs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road