MD SB119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a specified tax on premiums of for-profit health maintenance organizations; repealing provisions of law that require specified nonprofit health maintenance organizations to transfer funds in an amount equal to the value of a specified premium tax exemption to the Medical Assistance Program Account, require the funds to be allocated in a specified manner, and require the health maintenance organizations to file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a report establishing transfer of the funds; etc.
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Premium Tax and Transfer of Premium Tax Exemption Value - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Exemptions
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Physicians
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Community Facilities and Services
Exemptions
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Physicians
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0119?ys=2015rs |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0119f.pdf |