MD SB1171 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a state grant be made available to fund the increased operating expenses for the branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that increase their operating hours above the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016; requiring the Governor to include in the State operating budget $3,000,000 to support specified additional operating expenses of the Enoch Pratt Free Library branches in fiscal years 2018 through 2022; stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding increased hours in poor and underserved communities; etc.
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-45) (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {993224/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {993224/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-45) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {993224/1 Rejected (14-31) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Grants
Libraries
Reports
Time
Budgets
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Grants
Libraries
Reports
Time