MD SB117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to adopt a local law that authorizes the county or municipal corporation to revoke or not renew the business license of an establishment for the second or subsequent conviction of an employee of the establishment if the violation involves selling or delivering drug paraphernalia to a minor and occurs on the property of the business establishment.
Title
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent Violation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations