MD SB116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Recycling in the Department of the Environment to promote the development of markets for recycled materials and recycled products in the State; requiring the Office to evaluate the availability of certain markets and identify businesses in the State that use recycled materials; requiring that the annual Maryland solid waste management and diversion report be submitted to the General Assembly by September 1, 2022, and each year thereafter, and include certain activities; etc.
Title
Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434039/1 Adopted |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB164 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Subjects
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
General Services, Department of
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Transportation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
General Services, Department of
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |