MD HB164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1452

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Recycling in the Department of the Environment to promote the development of markets for recycled materials and products in the State; requiring the Office to evaluate the availability of certain markets and identify businesses in the State that use recycled materials; requiring the annual Maryland solid waste management and diversion report to be submitted to the General Assembly by September 1, 2022, and each year thereafter, and include certain activities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-11HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2021-02-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-10-05HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB116 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB1452 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91702(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91702.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback