MD SB1144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in entering into a certain contract under the Clean Water Commerce Account for the purchase of a certain environmental outcome, to allow certain nonuniform payment schedules for certain purposes; and authorizing the Department, in order to ensure certain outcomes, to require a minimum final payment and, for a contract award greater than $500,000, additional financial protections, including a letter of credit, insurance instrument, or performance bond.
Title
Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2024-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-8) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {873020/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Water Pollution
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Water Pollution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1605.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |