MD SB114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of New Horizons Supported Services, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |