MD SB1128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of "offshore drilling activity" to mean the exploration, development, or production of oil or gas in, on, or under the outer continental shelf and the transportation of oil or gas from the outer continental shelf; establishing that an offshore drilling activity is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a person that causes a spill of oil or gas while engaged in an offshore drilling activity is strictly liable for certain damages; etc.
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {473323/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-93) (Y: 48 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {473323/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-93) (Y: 48 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-23) |
2018-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment {473323/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-93) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {562214/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {498177/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {498177/1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |