MD SB1128 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the County Executive of Frederick County may not be a party to specified collective bargaining agreements but may attend and participate in all collective bargaining sessions of specified deputy sheriffs and correctional officers of the Frederick County Sheriff's Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-11) (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
2016-04-11SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (124-11)
2016-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2016-04-09HouseHearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
2016-04-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2016-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2016-03-24SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-03-24SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-03-24SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2016-03-18SenateHearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
2016-03-17SenateHearing cancelled
2016-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-01SenateRereferred to Finance
2016-02-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback