MD SB1120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland for financing the projects; and providing that the bonds are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions.
Title
University System of Maryland – Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:15 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Higher Education
Prince George's County
State Universities and Colleges
Building Maintenance and Repair
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Higher Education
Prince George's County
State Universities and Colleges