MD SB1114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is prohibited from assuming or continuing to take responsibility for a patient's pregnancy and birth care and is required to arrange for the orderly transfer of care of the patient; altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is required to consult with a health care practitioner; requiring the State Board of Nursing, in consultation with stakeholders, to review and update as necessary the informed consent agreement at least every 4 years; etc.
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {784135/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy