MD SB1108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that every deputy clerk or deputy sheriff in Carroll County take and sign the oath or affirmation prescribed by the Maryland Constitution.
Title
Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-9) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB720 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |