MD SB1104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate the portion of Maryland Route 924 (Emmorton Road) between its intersections with Maryland Route 24 and Singer Road as Heroes Highway.
Title
Transportation - Highways - Heroes Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |