MD SB1102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Worcester County a 1-day beer and wine tasting license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue a license to an organization representing local governments in the State for a specified purpose; prohibiting the Board from issuing more than two licenses per year; providing that an organization may apply for not more than one license per year; providing a license fee of $100; etc.
Title
Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center - Beer and Wine Tasting License
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Education
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Ocean City
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Time
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Education
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Ocean City
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Time
Weights and Measures