MD SB1091 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for each county board of education regarding provision of the instructional materials that will be used in the upcoming school year by students with individualized education programs; requiring the county board to coordinate with the Instructional Resources Center to provide instructional materials in a specialized format to blind or visually impaired students; requiring, beginning January 1, 2025, certain textbook publishers to provide an electronic file of pupil edition textbooks to a certain entity; etc.
Title
Education – Blind and Visually Impaired Students – Textbook Equity
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report {463727/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {463727/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Palakovich Carr, Grossman and Mireku-North) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2024-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Palakovich Carr, Grossman and Mireku-North) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Watson, Lewis Young and Carozza) |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Watson, Lewis Young and Carozza) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163924/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {933627/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Blind Persons
Contracts
Disabled
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Documents
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Students
Textbooks
Time
Blind Persons
Contracts
Disabled
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Documents
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Students
Textbooks
Time