MD SB1086 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified individuals who apply for alcoholic beverages licenses for the use of a partnership, corporation, club, or limited liability company in Baltimore City from specified residency and registered voter requirements; and establishing specified requirements for the issuance of an alcoholic beverages license to a partnership, corporation, or club in Baltimore City.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-3) (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (122-0) (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (122-0) (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3) |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (122-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933891/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104233/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Corporations
Exemptions
Identification
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Registration
Residency
Signatures
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Corporations
Exemptions
Identification
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Registration
Residency
Signatures
Voting