MD SB1084 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to review program proposals; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations that provide for the receipt of comments and objections from appropriate parties following submission of a completed proposal and the review of objections received by the Commission in accordance with a specified process; etc.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Review of Program Proposals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Zirkin) {783724/1 Adopted (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {723620/1 Adopted (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {263627/1 Rejected (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Zirkin) {783724/1 Adopted (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {723620/1 Adopted (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {263627/1 Rejected (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (31-15) | |
2010-03-30 | Special Order later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-29 | Motion Withdrawn Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment (Senator Della) Adopted | |
2010-03-28 | Special Order 3/31 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted | |
2010-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted (28-19) | |
2010-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) Adopted (27-20) | |
2010-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) Rejected (22-23) | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Special Order 3/30 (Senator Brochin) Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Senate Rules |