MD SB1083 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Senators Klausmeier, Jennings, and Rosapepe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to notify the appropriate health occupations board of a possible violation of law or breach of professional standards by a dispenser or prescriber only if the technical advisory committee makes a recommendation for referral and a certain finding; requiring the program to provide the health occupations board with the data necessary for an investigation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateSenators Klausmeier, Jennings, and Rosapepe
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
2018-04-07HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (132-1)
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {986881/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-06HouseHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-04HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {677071/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback