MD SB1068 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 75% or more the percentage of State money that must be used in an elementary or a secondary school construction project before the Prevailing Wage Law applies; etc.
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - School Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Construction
Contractors
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Contractors
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement